24 times 27
Understand the Problem
The question is asking for the product of two numbers, 24 and 27. It requires a mathematical multiplication operation to find the result.
Answer
$648$
Answer for screen readers
The product of 24 and 27 is $648$.
Steps to Solve
- Set up the multiplication operation
To find the product of the two numbers, we will write it in mathematical form as: $$ 24 \times 27 $$
- Perform the multiplication
We can break this down into smaller steps or calculate it directly.
Calculating directly: $$ 24 \times 27 = 648 $$
Alternatively, we can break it down to show how it can be calculated using the distributive property: $$ 24 \times 27 = 24 \times (20 + 7) = 24 \times 20 + 24 \times 7 $$
Calculating each part: $$ 24 \times 20 = 480 $$ $$ 24 \times 7 = 168 $$
Now, we can add these two results together: $$ 480 + 168 = 648 $$
The product of 24 and 27 is $648$.
More Information
The multiplication of two numbers is one of the fundamental operations in arithmetic. In this case, multiplying 24 by 27 results in 648, which can be useful in various real-life scenarios, such as calculating area or total amounts.
Tips
- A common mistake is to miscalculate one of the multiplication parts, especially when breaking down the product using the distributive property. Double-checking each step can help avoid this.
- Another mistake is forgetting to add the partial products correctly.